|
|
Litigation Releases - Fourth Quarter 1996
Release No. | Date | Action | LR-15202 | Dec. 30, 1996 | Nicholas A. Rudi, Public Capital Advisors, Inc.,
Joseph C. Salema, George L. Tuttle, Jr., and Alexander S.Williams | LR-15201 | Dec. 30, 1996 | Theta Group L.L.C., Shadowstone Partners I,
L.L.C., Scott S. Bell and R. Scot Rubel | LR-15200 | Dec. 30, 1996 | Marguerite Lenfest's | LR-15199 | Dec. 26, 1996 | Richard M. Simonson | LR-15198 | Dec. 26, 1996 | Rehan Malik | LR-15197 | Dec. 19, 1996 | Oscar William Olson, Jr. | LR-15196 | Dec. 19, 1996 | Blythe Olin Selden and Shiawassee Shores
Retirement Park, Inc. | LR-15195 | Dec. 19, 1996 | Lynn Roy Oyler | LR-15194 | Dec. 19,
1996 | Lancaster Broadcasting Partners, Raymond P.
O'Connor and R.P. O'Connor and Associates, Inc. | LR-15193 | Dec. 19, 1996 | Mark S. Ferber | LR-15192 | Dec. 18, 1996 | Michael Donald McGahee | LR-15191 | Dec. 18, 1996 | Michael R. Warren | LR-15190 | Dec. 18, 1996 | Parris H. Holmes, Jr. | LR-15189 | Dec. 18, 1996 | Morris Dabah, Robert Reiss, Stanley A.
Greenstein and David Keery | LR-15188 | Dec. 16, 1996 | Michael Levine | LR-15187 |
Dec. 16, 1996 | Bernard F. Bradstreet and Thomas E. Campbell | LR-15186 | Dec. 12, 1996
| Hugh Keith and Stephen Wolis | LR-15185 | Dec. 12, 1996 | Nancy Ellis Davis, Jack Weinstein, Nancy
Weinstein, Adobe Galleries Inc. d/b/a Tower of Jewels, Loretta
Davis, Barclay Davis, William Daw, Sonya Daw, Mary Jane Hubbard,
David Goldstein, Starlog Franchise Corp., Hope Associates,
L.L.C., Michael Michaelson, Raymond J. Markman, Herman Rush, Mark
Savel, George Holsten, J.S. Holdings, Inc., Jeffrey Szur, Lynda
Lou Kane, also known as Lynda Lou Kraft, and Investors
Associates, Inc. | LR-15184 | Dec. 12, 1996 | Georgia Pooley Helliwell | LR-15183 | Dec. 11,
1996 | Environmental Chemicals Group, Inc., Curtis A.
Younts, Jr., Calvin Shenkir, Jr. and Calvin Moerbe | LR-15182 |
Dec. 10, 1996 | Met Capital Corporation and Jeffrey Hackman | LR-15181 | Dec. 9, 1996 | R. E. Anderson Cain | LR-15180 | Dec. 9, 1996 | Charles Brumfield | LR-15179 | Dec. 6, 1996 | Thomas S. Mackie, Jr. | LR-15178 | Dec. 6, 1996 | Pleasure Time, Inc., Minette Acra Kelly, Minette
Acra Kelly (Acra), and Richard A. Welch | LR-15177 |
Dec. 5, 1996 | Gerald P. Hirsch and Churchill Securities, Inc. | LR-15176 | Dec.
4, 1996 | Gerald P. Hirsch and Churchill Securities, Inc. | LR-15175 | Dec.
3, 1996 | Robert C. Cowan and Cowan Asset Management, Inc. | LR-15174 | Dec. 3, 1996 | William Dennis Brosseau | LR-15173 | Dec. 3, 1996 | Randy Glad and Howard Ray | LR-15172 | Dec. 3, 1996 | Paul B. Kravitz | LR-15171 | Dec.
2, 1996 | Brett L. Bouchy and Richard C. Whelan | LR-15170 | Dec. 2, 1996 | Mitchell S. Rosenthal | LR-15169 | Dec. 2, 1996 | Howard S. Hoover, Jr. | LR-15168 | Nov. 26, 1996 | Gateways to Space, Inc. | LR-15167 | Nov. 26,
1996 | American Education Corporation | LR-15166 | Nov. 25, 1996 | Hyannis Trading Advisors, Inc., Jeremiah J. Hegarty and
Michael P. Hegarty | LR-15164 | Nov. 21, 1996 | Montedison, S.p.A. | LR-15163 | Nov.
21, 1996 | Joseph A. Bremont, Comcar International, Ltd.,
Commercial Capital Resources, Inc., and Jimmy B. Sanchez | LR-15162 | Nov. 20, 1996 | Robert Clifford Cowan | LR-15161 | Nov. 20, 1996 | Philip S. Sindler | LR-15160 | Nov. 20, 1996 | CS First Boston Corporation, Jerry L. Nowlin and
Douglas S. Montague | LR-15159 | Nov. 19, 1996 | Teresa V. Fernandez | LR-15158 | Nov. 14, 1996 | Richard Beckwitt | LR-15157 | Nov. 13, 1996 | Christopher K. Bagdasarian | LR-15156 | Nov. 13,
1996 | Peter Buccheri and David S. Weil | LR-15155 | Nov. 12, 1996 | Peter Appleton Jones | LR-15154 | Nov. 7, 1996 | Robert C.Cowan, CS Investments Trust, and Cowan
Asset Management, Inc. | LR-15153 |
Nov. 7, 1996 | Charles O. Huttoe, Huttoe & Associates, Inc.,
Word Corporation, National Trading Services, Inc., Karen
Purvis, Tammy Jo Perkins, Josephine Brooks, SGA Goldstar Research
Inc., Theodore R. Melcher, Jr., Shannon B. Terry, Systems of
Excellence, Inc., Alpha Securities Ltd., and Dunbar Holdings Ltd | LR-15152 | Nov. 7, 1996 | W. Ralph Wills, III and ProFinancial Advisors,
Inc. | LR-15151 | Nov. 5, 1996 | Frederick Aug.us Moran | LR-15150 | Nov. 5, 1996 | Consumer Plus, L.C., Palmer Research and
Development and David R. Palmer | LR-15149 | Nov.
5, 1996 | Shaner & Company, Inc., and Mark Shaner | LR-15148 | Nov. 5, 1996 | George J. Handgis | LR-15147 | Nov. 4, 1996 | Gary V. Lewellyn | LR-15146 | Nov. 4, 1996 | Paul A. Bilzerian | LR-15145 | Nov. 4, 1996 | John Glen Kendall | LR-15144 | Nov. 4,
1996 | Michael W. Crow and Peter F. Kuebler | LR-15143 | Nov. 1, 1996 | Shahryar Soroosh | LR-15142 | Nov. 1, 1996 | Michael J. Colello | LR-15141 | Oct. 30, 1996 | Shahryar Soroosh | LR-15140 | Oct. 29, 1996 | John F. D'Acquisto, D'Acquisto Financial Group,
Inc., Doubleday Trust and Thomas F. Goodman | LR-15139 | Oct. 29, 1996 | Scott A. Frye | LR-15138 | Oct. 29, 1996 | Frank S. Colin | LR-15137 | Oct. 29, 1996 | Balance for Life, Inc., and Richard K. Steele,
Sr. | LR-15136 | Oct. 25, 1996 | Joseph Polichemi, Lyle Neal, Oscar William Olson,
Jr., and Charles Padilla | LR-15135 |
Oct. 24, 1996 | Harry Watson, Tracy French and Deltaur Partners | LR-15134 |
Oct. 23, 1996 | Western Executive Group, Inc., Cash Systems USA,
Inc., Charles R. Rietz, Robert R. Parrish and Robert J. Struth | LR-15133 | Oct. 22, 1996 | Darrell Sandy Marsh | LR-15132 | Oct. 22, 1996 | Benjamin Franklin Bush, III and Ben Bush
Investment Management, Inc. | LR-15131 | Oct. 22, 1996 | James M. Gleason, Michael C. Booth, Timothy M.
Choquette and Jeff R. Urbach | LR-15130 | Oct. 21, 1996 | James G. Freeman | LR-15129 | Oct. 21, 1996 | Don Haywood Pace | LR-15128 | Oct. 21,
1996 | Mark J. Aronds and Michael J. Garzoni | LR-15127 | Oct.
18, 1996 | Berbun Associates, Inc. and Donald Bunsis | LR-15126 |
Oct. 18, 1996 | Michael Jonsson and Objective Invest Holding S.A. | LR-15125 | Oct. 16, 1996 | Peter M. Harrington | LR-15124 | Oct. 16, 1996 | Healthcare Services Group, Inc., Daniel P.
McCartney, Thomas A. Cook and Melvyn B. Mason | LR-15123 | Oct. 15, 1996 | George A. Rotelli | LR-15122 | Oct. 15, 1996 | Kent Ahrens | LR-15121 | Oct. 15, 1996 | Western Executive Group, Inc., Cash Systems USA,
Inc., Charles R. Rietz, Robert R. Parrish, Robert J. Struth and R.
Stephen Edgel | LR-15120 | Oct. 11, 1996 | Bruce Franklin | LR-15119 |
Oct. 11, 1996 | Frank P. Zitkevitz and Charles S. Christopher | LR-15118 | Oct. 11, 1996 | James W. Adams | LR-15117 | Oct. 11,
1996 | James S. Faller, II, and Rolan Colon | LR-15116 | Oct.
9,
1996 | Richard Bertoli and Richard Cannistraro | LR-15115 | Oct. 9, 1996 | Frederick L. Cameron | LR-15114 | Oct. 9, 1996 | Axiom Security Solutions, Inc. and Paul L.
Parshall | LR-15113 | Oct. 8, 1996 | Robert F. Doviak, II | LR-15112 | Oct. 7, 1996 | James Russell Cleveland | LR-15111 |
Oct. 7, 1996 | Kenneth E. Edwards, Roger S. Chedester, Donald E.
Luna, A.R. Grant Morehouse and First American Companies, Inc. | LR-15110 | Oct. 4,
1996 | Anthony Sarivola and Donna Sarivola | LR-15109 | Oct. 4, 1996 | Grant R. Curtis, Leo J. Mangan, Timothy M. Masley,
Pedro Gomez, Ray Irangy, James W. Nearen | LR-15108 | Oct. 3, 1996 | Michael Tropiano | LR-15107 | Oct. 3, 1996 | Ronald A. Monzione, James D. Rocco and Arthur R.
Lapka | LR-15106 | Oct. 3, 1996 | Western Executive Group, Inc., Cash Systems USA, Inc., Charles R. Rietz; Robert R. Parrish, Robert J. Struth, R. Stephen Edgel; | LR-15105 | Oct. 2, 1996 | Gary W. Berus, Patricia S. Gale, Robert W. Harper
(Harper) and Nancy A. Swoffer | LR-15104 | Oct.
2, 1996 | Joseph P. Medsker, Unified Financial Services
Agency Corp. and Unified Financial Services Advisory Corp. | LR-15103 | Oct. 2, 1996 | John W. Walsh, Jr., InterCap Monitoring
Corporation, Security Data Group, Inc., InterCap Monitoring Income
Funds IV-A, B, C, and D, Ltd., InterCap Monitoring Income Funds V
and V-B, Ltd | LR-15102 |
Oct.
1, 1996 | The AppleTree Companies, Inc., Michael H.
Salit, David B. Lobel, Paul B. Kravitz and W. Scott Long III | LR-15101 | Oct. 1, 1996 | Benjamin Franklin Bush, III and Ben Bush
Investment Management, Inc. | LR-15100 | Oct. 3,
1996 | Casey Abe, Calbert Abe, Patricia Abe, Denise Abe
F/K/A/ Denise Miyasato, Gladys Tengan and Lena Lynch |
http://www.sec.gov/litigation/litreleases/lit4q96.shtml
|